MA S1241 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2683
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the fees charged for the certification of firefighters as emergency medical technicians. Public Health.
Title
Relative to firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2683 |
2020-02-10 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3054 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3079 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4104 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2683 (Replaced by) 2020-05-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2210 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2359 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H3079 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1515 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2264
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2502 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S1546 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Accompanied H2378
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2349 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4104 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2683 (Replaced by) 2020-05-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1241 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1241.pdf |