MA S1244 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit smoking near public housing buildings. Public Health.
Title
Prohibiting smoking near public housing buildings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-07-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1929 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1310 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S704 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S119 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H196
H1310 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
S2299 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1310 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S704 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S119 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H196
H1310 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
S2299 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2528
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1244 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1244.pdf |