MA S1254 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote health information exchanges. Public Health.
Title
Promoting health information exchanges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1484 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1186 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2329 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2019
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1186 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2329 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 104 of the Acts of 2019
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1254.pdf |