MA S1264 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2751

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent cancers caused by human papilloma virus. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to preventing cancers caused by human papilloma virus

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2751
2020-04-27HouseHouse concurred
2020-04-23SenateReporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-10HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-06SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-04JointHearing rescheduled to 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2019-09-26JointHearing scheduled for 10/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S657 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1848 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2736 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1021 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1025 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1484 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2284 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1933 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4211
S616 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2751 (Replaced by) 2020-06-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback