MA S1279 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to regulate flavored tobacco products. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating flavored tobacco products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1503 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1663 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2292 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1378 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S112 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S1342 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H4001 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback