MA S1293 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote public health through the prevention and wellness trust fund. Public Health.
Title
To promote public health through the prevention and wellness trust fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Report amended by substitution of bill |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under JR10) |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-12 | House | House concurred |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S664 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1196 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H425 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S265 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S664 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1196 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S208 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H425 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S265 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1293 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1293.pdf |