MA S1308 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2278
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure consumer choice and equal access to eye care. Public Health.
Title
Ensuring consumer choice and equal access to eye care
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2278 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S2278 (Replaced by) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1705 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H276 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
S2278 (Replaced by) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1308.pdf |