MA S1331 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to essential health services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to essential health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2091 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1135 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2019
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2091 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S1135 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2019
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1331 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1331.pdf |