MA S1336 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2698
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2698
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists. Public Health.
Title
Relative to acupuncture detoxification specialists
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. David Biele [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] | Rep. Sean Garballey [D] |
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2698 |
2019-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1283 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2698 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2698 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1336 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1336.pdf |