MA S1337 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to requiring trauma kits in public buildings. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to requiring trauma kits in public buildings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2547
2019-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1870 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S75 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback