MA S1338 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2547

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to athletic training . Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to athletic training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2547
2019-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/19/2019 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1100 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H408 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S562 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H3483 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback