MA S1360 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied S1380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the creation of the Commonwealth technical rescue regions and coordinating council. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to the creation of the Commonwealth technical rescue regions and coordinating council
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Senate | Accompanied S1380 |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1660 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S197 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S1983 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1785 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1490 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1380 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2614
H4843 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2614
S1660 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S197 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2470
S1983 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1785 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1490 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1380 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2614
H4843 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Text of an amendment, see S2614
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1360 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1360.pdf |