MA S1376 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2553
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Postponed to Friday, July 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-10 - Postponed to Friday, July 31, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to automated enforcement. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to automated enforcement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | Senate | Postponed to Friday, July 31, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Pending Ways and Means new draft S2553 considered |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read second |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 27, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2553 |
2019-11-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-16 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2045 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3583 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3614 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3090 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2971 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2553 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3583 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3614 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
H3090 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2971 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2553 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1376 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1376.pdf |