MA S1379 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-03 - Hearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to strengthen inmate visitation. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To strengthen inmate visitation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-03JointHearing scheduled for 01/13/2020 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-11-26HouseHouse concurred
2019-11-25SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities
2019-11-01JointHearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H3430 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H1437 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H2035 (Similar To) 2019-11-01 - Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1010 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S969 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H1424 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H3328 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback