MA S1524 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2545
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize a local option for group retirement classification. Public Service.
Title
To authorize a local option for group retirement classification
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
Rep. John Barrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2545 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1667 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2795
H635 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3889 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
H635 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H3889 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2545 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Reported (in part) by S1477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1524 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1524.pdf |