MA S1529 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2366
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Massachusetts certified emergency telecommunications. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts certified emergency telecommunications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied H2366 |
2019-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3113 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
H1967 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1458 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H1720 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1164
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
S2020 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1943 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S912 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2366 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2078 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H3084 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3060
H1967 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1458 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H1720 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1164
H1275 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4942
S2020 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1943 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S912 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2298 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2366 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1529 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1529.pdf |