MA S1553 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to firefighter training. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to firefighter training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseAccompanied H2290
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1310 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2958 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H2022 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1694 (Similar To) 2019-06-21 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S1088 (Similar To) 2020-03-30 - Reporting date extended to Friday June 5, 2020, pending concurrence
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1307 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1288 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1383 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback