MA S1555 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to collective bargaining rights for employees of the committee for public counsel services. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the committee for public counsel services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1511 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2372 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1467 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1090 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2778
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H3854 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
H2372 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1467 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1114 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2385 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H1596 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3825
H2187 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2188 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2190 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1090 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2778
H3855 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Adopted, see H3854
H3854 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2019
S2273 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
S2282 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - See H3854
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1555 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1555.pdf |