MA S1556 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2538
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to incentivize efficiencies in the education system. Public Service.
Title
To incentivize efficiencies in the education system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2538 |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-05-06 | House | House concurred |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Education |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2479 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H1214 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S2048 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H145 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4232
H419 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3885 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1214 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S2048 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H145 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4232
H419 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3885 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2538 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1556 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1556.pdf |