MA S1578 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to post-retirement earnings of public retirees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to post-retirement earnings of public retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H1113 (Similar To) 2019-08-27 - Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1756 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H193 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1841 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H726 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2137 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1544 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S1976 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2386 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1902 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2196 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2211 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Placed on file
S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
H4045 (Similar To) 2019-08-12 - Senate concurred
S2324 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2339 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S2379 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback