MA S1579 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2213
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the hours of employment of pensioners for services after retirement in the public sector. Public Service.
Title
Relative to increasing the hours of employment of pensioners for services after retirement in the public sector
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Accompanied H2213 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4240 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2020
H4254 (Similar To) 2020-07-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4855
H2213 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2290 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4240 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2020
H4254 (Similar To) 2020-07-15 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4855
H2213 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1579.pdf |