MA S1583 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2360
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Accompanied H2360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to surviving family of emergency medical technicians. Public Service.
Title
Relative to surviving family members of public emergency medical technicians
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Edward Coppinger [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Accompanied H2360 |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2164 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2167 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2020
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H2360 (Replaced by) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1512 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H2268 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2167 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2020
H1638 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2182 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2348 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2215
S1687 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2618
H2317 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Accompanied S1554
H2229 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4006 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
S2311 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2332 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
H2360 (Replaced by) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1583 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1583.pdf |