MA S1672 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Charlton to impose an additional excise tax on gasoline and diesel fuel. Revenue. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Charlton to establish an additional excise on sales of gasoline and diesel fuel
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 10, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday March 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1187 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2524
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2020
H4034 (Similar To) 2020-08-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 168 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1672 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1672.pdf |