MA S1690 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts student relief and retention tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts student relief and retention tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2397 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5031
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2418 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2434
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S1756 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1706 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2418 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1767 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4465
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H5040 (Replaced by) 2020-10-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1690 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1690.pdf |