MA S1735 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to oversight of capital expenditures in the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to oversight of capital expenditures in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S737 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1297 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1064 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1326 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H5 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4061
H2249 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2422 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1297 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1064 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1326 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H5 (Similar To) 2017-12-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4061
H2249 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H2422 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1735.pdf |