MA S1754 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the taxation of above ground conduits, wires, and pipes used in the transportation of natural gas. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the taxation of above ground conduits, wires, and pipes used in the transportation of natural gas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1753 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1965 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1969 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1967 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S456 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2878 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1991 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2909 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4008
S1965 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1969 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1967 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S456 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S522
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2878 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1991 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2909 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4008
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1754.pdf |