MA S1774 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to dedicate a portion of the stabilization fund to cities and towns. Revenue.
Title
Dedicating a portion of the stabilization fund to cities and towns
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2549 |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H1826 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2275 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H2559 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied H2658
H341 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S216 (Similar To) 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H254 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H1792 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4289
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1774.pdf |