MA S1803 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2569

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to spark the modernization of state heating systems. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sparking the modernization of state heating systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2569
2019-07-18JointHearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S1957 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1925
S1978 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1979 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1901 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2832 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4551
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H575 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4182
H4050 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Discharged to the Joint Committee on Financial Services
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback