MA S1804 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit the impact of student loans to help staff succeed. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Limiting the impact of student loans to help staff succeed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H998 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3977
H1196 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S56 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2428
S1649 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1845 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied H3620
H163 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
S1605 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1196 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S56 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2428
S1649 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1845 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Accompanied H3620
H163 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4233
S1605 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1804 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1804.pdf |