MA S1872 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate May 6 as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating May 6 as Moyamoya Disease Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-01-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Accompanied by H2756 |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2736 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2756 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Accompanied S1872
H2756 (Similar To) 2019-07-30 - Accompanied S1872
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1872 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1872.pdf |