MA S1904 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to observe Unites States Navy Day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Observing United States Navy Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 18 of the Acts of 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-02-05 | House | Enacted |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Read second, amended (Rules), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed. |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment |
2019-07-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H2364 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
H2364 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S2291 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1904 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1904.pdf |