MA S1938 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish rate options to reduce customer costs and lower peak demand. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish rate options to reduce customer costs and lower peak demand

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H2806 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
H587 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
H2890 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1944 (Similar To) 2019-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S1947 (Similar To) 2019-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2854 (Similar To) 2019-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback