MA S1944 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to improving reliability and resiliency of electricity distribution infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to improving reliability and resiliency of electricity distribution infrastructure

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-02JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

H731 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3146 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1982 (Similar To) 2019-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2007 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
S812 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1909 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
S460 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S579 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H2901 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2828 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H2899 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback