MA S1985 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the Energy Facilities Siting Board within the Department of Public Utilities. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the Energy Facilities Siting Board
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2829 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1985 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1985.pdf |