MA S1993 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to solar-powered mobility networks. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to solar-powered mobility networks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1359 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2676
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H4047 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2020
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S163 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1359 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2676
S702 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H4047 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2020
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4248 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4435
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1993 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1993.pdf |