MA S2028 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-5)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of elephants, big cats, primates, and bears in traveling exhibits and shows. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to the use of elephants, big cats, primates, and bears in traveling exhibits and shows
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2934 (Similar To) 2019-11-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3278 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2740 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S161 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H3278 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H2740 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2725
H3478 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2028 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2028.pdf |