MA S204 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Pending: Joint Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an industrial mill building revitalization task force. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Establishing an industrial mill building revitalization task force
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S341 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H1912 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4446
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1832 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2690 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S204.pdf |