MA S208 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Western Massachusetts remote worker relocation incentive program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Establishing the Western Massachusetts remote worker relocation incentive program
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] | Rep. Daniel Carey [D] |
Rep. Mindy Domb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S664 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1196 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H425 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S265 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S664 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1196 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H425 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1211 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
S265 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S208 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S208.pdf |