MA S2081 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2560

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Department of Highways to acquire a certain dam in the town of Norwood. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the Department of Highways to acquire a certain dam in the town of Norwood

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2560
2020-02-24SenateAccompanied S2560
2019-10-10JointHearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1334 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H864 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H3124 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2356 (Similar To) 2020-03-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 51 of the Acts of 2020
H3001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
S2560 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback