MA S2157 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Message from His Excellency the Governor (pursuant to Article II, Section 8 of Article LXXXIX of the Amendments to the Constitution) recommending legislation to validate certain proceedings of the town of Hull
Title
Validating certain proceedings of the town of Hull
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-30 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-04-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-09-05 | House | House concurred |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S2086 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
S2566 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2700
S2700 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2566 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - New draft (O'Connor) substituted, see S2700
S2700 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2157.pdf |