MA S2160 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to defining "Gold Star families". Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Defining "Gold Star families"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-10-19 | House | House concurred |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday October 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-05 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:30 PM in 428 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2161 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S157 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1006 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3616 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S157 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
S1006 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2044 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1526 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3616 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2160 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2160.pdf |