MA S2183 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4075

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To support improved financial stability in higher education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To support improved financial stability in higher education

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4075
2019-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-03-07HouseHouse concurred
2019-03-07SenateRead and referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1211 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H1217 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1023 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H604 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4157
S1214 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H4075 (Replaced by) 2019-10-02 - New draft substituted, see H4099
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback