MA S2192 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2055
Note: Legislation replaced by S2203
Note: Legislation replaced by S2203
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2192).
Title
Relative to gender identity on Massachusetts identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2203 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read second |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 25, 2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2203 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-04-04 | Senate | New draft of S2055 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2055 (Replaces) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2192
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2203 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1365 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S487 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S1421 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2203 (Replaced by) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2308 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2020
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H331 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2567
S1433 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2192.pdf |