MA S2193 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to invest more in middle class jobs and less in the relocation of out-of-state corporations. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To invest more in middle class jobs and less in the relocation of out-of-state corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 15, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-04 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-09-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2019-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H184 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1775 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S545 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S401 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S1775 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S545 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S401 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2193 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2193.pdf |