MA S2195 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to crediting the stabilization fund for the sale of Fuller School in the city of Gloucester. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crediting the stabilization fund for the sale of Fuller School in the city of Gloucester

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2019
2019-06-27SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2019-06-27HouseEnacted
2019-06-24HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2019-06-13HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2019-06-13HouseRules suspended
2019-06-13HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2019-06-10HouseRead; and referred to the House Committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2019-06-06SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2019-06-06SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2019-05-08SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2019-04-29JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred
2019-04-08SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H53 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1549 (Similar To) 2019-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3104 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2515 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H3588 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S2330 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2411 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback