MA S2196 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a fluoride task force. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a fluoride task force
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2547 |
2019-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-10 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2122 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1166 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S253 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S252 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S2284 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Accompanied H3851
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2122 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2547 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2196 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2196.pdf |