MA S2200 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2240
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the appointment of retired police officers as special police officers in the town of Milton. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the appointment of retired police officers as special police officers in the town of Milton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2240 |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H1333 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H2076 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2146
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Replaced by) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
S2361 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
H1334 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1335 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H396 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H2076 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H2146
H3823 (Similar To) 2019-08-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 63 of the Acts of 2019
H3824 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4022
S2240 (Replaced by) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 52 of the Acts of 2019
S2293 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2361
H4022 (Similar To) 2019-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2019
S2361 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2020
H3262 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4242 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2020
H4273 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2200.pdf |