MA S2238 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - New draft substituted, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - New draft substituted, see S2547
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to surplus lines insurance premiums. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to surplus lines insurance premiums
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2547 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read second |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2547 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-12-14 | House | House concurred |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
H2954 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S558 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S564 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2547 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S558 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1402 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S564 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2547 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2238 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2238.pdf |