MA S2289 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public safety and transparency by transportation network companies.
Title
Relative to public safety and transparency by transportation network companies
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Bill reported adversely by committee |
2020-07-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-07-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-06-01 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 2, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday June 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 25, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-07-12 | House | House concurred |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2040 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2806
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S1464 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S2379 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - House concurred
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2289 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2289.pdf |