MA S229 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4559
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4559
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a special commission on sports gaming. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Creating a special commission on sports gaming
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4559 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday February 28, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S43 (Similar To) 2020-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2723
H3524 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H4559 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S229 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S229.pdf |